WA SB6101 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning statewide implementation of early screening for dyslexia.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning statewide implementation of early screening for dyslexia.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HouseReturned to Senate Rules 3.
2020-02-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Education.
2020-02-12SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2020-02-12SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-11SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2020-02-03SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-01-31SenateEDU - Majority; do pass.
2020-01-31SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-15SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-13SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
2019-12-20SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB2290 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback