WA HB2290 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-05 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning statewide implementation of early screening for dyslexia.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning statewide implementation of early screening for dyslexia.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-05HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-03HouseED - Majority; do pass.
2020-02-03HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-21HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Education at 3:30 PM.
2020-01-13HouseFirst reading, referred to Education.
2020-01-03HousePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB6101 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback