WA SB6097 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the insurance commissioner to review a health carrier's surplus levels as part of its rate filing review process.
Title
Requiring the insurance commissioner to review a health carrier's surplus levels as part of its rate filing review process.
Sponsors
Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] | Sen. David Frockt [D] |
Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Emily Randall [D] | Sen. Reuven Carlyle [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 83 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 83 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-31 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-31 | Senate | Chapter 247, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-31 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 37; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2020-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 83; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee amendment |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-27 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-27 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-20 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-02-17 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |