WA SB6097 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the future teachers conditional scholarship and loan repayment program to increase the number of early elementary teachers.
Title
Modifying the future teachers conditional scholarship and loan repayment program to increase the number of early elementary teachers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |