WA SB6095 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing clear authority for the secretary of health to issue standing orders.
Title
Establishing clear authority for the secretary of health to issue standing orders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: do pass (Y: 9 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: do pass (Y: 9 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Senate | Effective date 6/6/2024. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Chapter 100, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-02-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-02-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 59; nays, 37; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2024-02-27 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-24 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-20 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-20 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2024-02-13 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |