WA SB6079 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the scope of taxation on land development or management services.
Title
Clarifying the scope of taxation on land development or management services.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | HSA - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability. |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2229 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6079&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6079.pdf |