WA SB6074 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-30 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:30 AM.
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-30 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:30 AM.
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning death benefits applicable to drivers of transportation network companies.
Title
Concerning death benefits applicable to drivers of transportation network companies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2382 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-19 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
51 | 16 | 250 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 32 | New Code | See Bill Text |