WA SB6072 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 7/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 7/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Dividing the state wildlife account into the fish, wildlife, and conservation account and the limited fish and wildlife account.
Title
Dividing the state wildlife account into the fish, wildlife, and conservation account and the limited fish and wildlife account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | Senate | Effective date 7/1/2021. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Chapter 148, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-29 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-29 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2238 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.