WA SB6055 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-29 - Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-29 - Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to health care.
Title
Relating to health care.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Hill [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |