WA SB6039 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning home appliance warranties.
Title
Concerning home appliance warranties.
Sponsors
Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Karen Fraser [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] | Sen. Sharon Nelson [D] | Sen. Craig Pridemore [D] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. | |
2012-12-16 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6039&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6039.pdf |