WA SB6031 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the student transportation allocation to accommodate multiple vehicle types for transporting students.
Title
Modifying the student transportation allocation to accommodate multiple vehicle types for transporting students.
Sponsors
Sen. John Braun [R] | Sen. Perry Dozier [R] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] |
Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-01 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments. |
2024-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2024-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-03-01 | House | Committee amendment |
2024-02-29 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-26 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-26 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2024-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM. |
2024-02-19 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2024-02-19 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2024-02-15 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2024-02-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2024-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28a | 160 | 150 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 160 | 170 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 160 | 180 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |