WA SB6021 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Effective date 6/7/2018*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Extending the period for voter registration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extending the period for voter registration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-27 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 50 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19SenateEffective date 6/7/2018*.
2018-03-19SenateChapter 112, 2018 Laws.
2018-03-19SenateGovernor signed.
2018-03-05SenateDelivered to Governor.
2018-03-03HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-01SenatePresident signed.
2018-02-27HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 50; nays, 48; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-02-27HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-21HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2018-02-20HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-15HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-02-15HouseSEIT - Majority; do pass.
2018-02-15HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-07HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-19HouseFirst reading, referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology
2018-01-17SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-01-17SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-01-17Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2018-01-17SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-01-15SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-01-12SenateSGTE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-01-12SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-10SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM.
2018-01-08SenateFirst reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.
2017-12-13SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB2297 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback