WA HB2297 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the period for voter registration.
Title
Extending the period for voter registration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2018-01-19 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-15 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-10 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-10 | House | SEIT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-09 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology |
2017-12-18 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6021 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-19 - Effective date 6/7/2018*.