WA SB5992 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Making 2011-2013 supplemental transportation appropriations.
Title
Making 2011-2013 supplemental transportation appropriations.
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Haugen [D] | Sen. Curtis King [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Rules. | |
2012-03-08 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2012-02-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2012-02-23 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2012-02-23 | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2012-02-22 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2012-02-21 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-12-12 | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2190 (Crossfiled) 2012-03-23 - Effective date 3/23/2012*.