WA SB5991 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-2)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Effective date 1/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-2)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Effective date 1/1/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing transparency of contributions by creating the Washington state DISCLOSE act of 2018.
Title
Increasing transparency of contributions by creating the Washington state DISCLOSE act of 2018.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Senate | Effective date 1/1/2019. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Chapter 111, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 33; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2018-02-28 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 53; nays, 45; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-28 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-28 | House | Committee amendment |
2018-02-26 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-21 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-21 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-21 | House | SEIT - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-20 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2018-02-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-19 | House | First reading, referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 32; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-01-12 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2455 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-23 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM.