WA HB2455 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-23 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-23 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing transparency of contributions by creating the Washington state DISCLOSE act of 2018.
Title
Increasing transparency of contributions by creating the Washington state DISCLOSE act of 2018.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-23 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-19 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-16 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology |
Same As/Similar To
SB5991 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-19 - Effective date 1/1/2019.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2455&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2455.pdf |