WA SB5982 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Effective date 3/13/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Effective date 3/13/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Updating the definition of "vaccine" in RCW 70.290.010 to include all federal food and drug administration-approved immunizations recommended by the centers for disease control and prevention.
Title
Updating the definition of "vaccine" in RCW 70.290.010 to include all federal food and drug administration-approved immunizations recommended by the centers for disease control and prevention.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Senate | Effective date 3/13/2024. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Chapter 41, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-02-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-02-22 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 61; nays, 32; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2024-02-22 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-21 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-16 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-16 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-16 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2024-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-05 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2157 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.