WA SB5970 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the crisis intervention response team pilot project.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the crisis intervention response team pilot project.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2018-02-26HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2018-02-23HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-02-22HousePS - Majority; do pass with amendment
2018-02-22HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM.
2018-02-20HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM.
2018-02-19HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM.
2018-02-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Public Safety
2018-02-12SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2018-02-12SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-12Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2018-02-12SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-02-12Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2018-02-08SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-02-06SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2018-02-06SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-02-06SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-05SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2018-02-02SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2018-02-01SenateLAW - Majority; without recommendation.
2018-02-01SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2018-02-01SenateLAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-02-01SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2018-01-29SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2018-01-08SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-06-29SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.

Same As/Similar To

HB2234 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback