WA SB5958 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-31 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education & Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-31 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education & Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Washington career skills grant program.
Title
Establishing the Washington career skills grant program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |