WA SB5953 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting from the prevailing wage laws work performed or funded by nonprofit organizations.
Title
Exempting from the prevailing wage laws work performed or funded by nonprofit organizations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Moved to Rules White Sheet. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | CL - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2015 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5953&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5953.pdf |