WA SB5952 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the definition of "sexual orientation" for malicious harassment prosecution purposes.
Title
Modifying the definition of "sexual orientation" for malicious harassment prosecution purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-04-22 | Chapter 180, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-04-22 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-16 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-09 | President signed. | |
2009-04-08 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 68; nays, 30; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-04-08 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-06 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-27 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-25 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-03-25 | PSEP - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-25 | PSEP - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-25 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-24 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-03-13 | First reading, referred to Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness. | |
2009-03-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 36; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-03-10 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-25 | JUD - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-25 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-02-09 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2219 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.