WA SB5951 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting the voter's signature and telephone number on envelopes provided for return of voted ballots.
Title
Protecting the voter's signature and telephone number on envelopes provided for return of voted ballots.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-26 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-02-13 | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-01-11 | Made eligible to be placed on third reading. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-03-13 | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. | |
2009-03-11 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2009-03-11 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-05 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-02-19 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-19 | GO - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-17 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-16 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 7:45 AM. | |
2009-02-09 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5951&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5951.pdf |