WA SB5950 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the social work professional loan repayment program.
Title
Creating the social work professional loan repayment program.
Sponsors
Sen. Emily Randall [D] | Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] | Sen. Steve O'Ban [R] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] |
Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | HEWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |