WA SB5945 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing the siting of schools and school facilities.
Title
Addressing the siting of schools and school facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Returned to Rules. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 2:30 PM. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5945&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5945.pdf |