WA SB5941 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-15 - Effective date 7/1/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-15 - Effective date 7/1/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning judicial branch funding.
Title
Concerning judicial branch funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-22 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 29 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 58 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 58 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-15 | Effective date 7/1/2011. | |
2011-06-15 | Chapter 44, 2011 Laws 1st Special Session. | |
2011-06-15 | Governor signed. | |
2011-05-25 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-05-24 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-05-23 | President signed. | |
2011-05-22 | Passed final passage; yeas, 29; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2011-05-22 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2011-05-21 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 58; nays, 29; absent, 0; excused, 11. | |
2011-05-21 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-05-21 | Floor amendment | |
2011-05-21 | Committee amendment not adopted. | |
2011-05-06 | Placed on second reading. | |
2011-05-05 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-05-05 | WAYS - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2011-05-05 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-05-05 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2011-05-05 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-05-03 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 26; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 6. | |
2011-05-03 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-28 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-04-28 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-04-28 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-04-28 | WM - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-04-28 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:30 AM. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 2:30 PM. | |
2011-04-14 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |