WA SB5936 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Convening a palliative care benefit work group.
Title
Convening a palliative care benefit work group.
Sponsors
Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Perry Dozier [R] | Sen. Noel Frame [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] |
Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Jesse Salomon [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | Effective date 6/6/2024. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Chapter 166, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-02-29 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2024-02-29 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-28 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-16 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-16 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2024-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-05 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2024-01-02 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |