WA SB5925 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning diversion of nonfelony charges when a party has raised the issue of competency to stand trial.
Title
Concerning diversion of nonfelony charges when a party has raised the issue of competency to stand trial.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass HSMH 15 bill proposed by Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:45 PM. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:30 PM. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | HSMH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |