WA SB5923 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-30 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-30 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing fentanyl and other substance use prevention education.
Title
Addressing fentanyl and other substance use prevention education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2023-12-29 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1956 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-19 - Effective date 3/19/2024.