WA SB5921 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-15 - Effective date 7/1/2011*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-15 - Effective date 7/1/2011*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Revising social services programs.
Title
Revising social services programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-16 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 78 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 78 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-15 | Effective date 7/1/2011*. | |
2011-06-15 | Chapter 42, 2011 Laws 1st Special Session PV. | |
2011-06-15 | Governor partially vetoed. | |
2011-05-25 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-05-22 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-05-17 | President signed. | |
2011-05-16 | Passed final passage; yeas, 44; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. | |
2011-05-16 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2011-05-13 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 70; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 10. | |
2011-05-13 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-05-13 | Committee amendment adopted as amended. | |
2011-05-12 | Placed on second reading. | |
2011-05-11 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-05-11 | WAYS - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2011-05-11 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-05-11 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. | |
2011-05-05 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-04-29 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2011-04-27 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. | |
2011-04-27 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-27 | Floor amendment | |
2011-04-27 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-22 | Referred to Rules. | |
2011-04-18 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-04-18 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-04-15 | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-04-14 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-04-13 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 2:30 PM. | |
2011-04-07 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |