WA SB5913 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - Effective date 6/7/2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - Effective date 6/7/2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the permissible deposit of public funds with credit unions.
Title
Increasing the permissible deposit of public funds with credit unions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-27 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | Effective date 6/7/2012. | |
2012-03-07 | Chapter 26, 2012 Laws. | |
2012-03-07 | Governor signed. | |
2012-03-01 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2012-02-29 | Speaker signed. | |
2012-02-28 | President signed. | |
2012-02-27 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 80; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2012-02-27 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-24 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2012-02-20 | Referred to Rules 2 Review. | |
2012-02-16 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2012-02-16 | BFS - Majority; do pass. | |
2012-02-16 | BFS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2012-02-16 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 8:00 AM. | |
2012-02-11 | First reading, referred to Business & Financial Services. | |
2012-02-09 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2012-02-09 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-07 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2012-01-19 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2012-01-19 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2012-01-19 | FIHI - Majority; do pass. | |
2012-01-17 | Public hearing, executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, and Housing & Insurance at 10:00 AM. | |
2012-01-11 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-05 | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance. |