WA SB5911 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-15 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-15 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Enhancing cancer research funding by dedicating a portion of state sales tax collections in October to the Andy Hill cancer research endowment fund.
Title
Enhancing cancer research funding by dedicating a portion of state sales tax collections in October to the Andy Hill cancer research endowment fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Lynda Wilson [R] | Sen. Perry Dozier [R] | Sen. Keith Wagoner [R] | Sen. Judith Warnick [R] |
Sen. Jeff Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-12-27 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 348 | 080 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 08 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |