WA SB5893 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing gate money to individuals releasing from custody prior to the expiration of their sentence. Revised for 2nd Substitute: Providing gate money to incarcerated individuals at the department of corrections.
Title
Providing gate money to individuals releasing from custody prior to the expiration of their sentence. Revised for 2nd Substitute: Providing gate money to incarcerated individuals at the department of corrections.
Sponsors
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Noel Frame [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] |
Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] | Sen. Yasmin Trudeau [D] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry: do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry: do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Senate | Effective date 6/6/2024. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Chapter 32, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-02-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-02-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 69; nays, 26; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2024-02-27 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-24 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-20 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-20 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-20 | House | CSJR - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry at 4:00 PM. |
2024-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-15 | House | First reading, referred to Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 34; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | HS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services. |
2023-12-21 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1995 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-08 - First reading, referred to Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
72 | 02 | 100 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
72 | 66 | 070 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |