WA SB5886 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating an advisory council on rare diseases.
Title
Creating an advisory council on rare diseases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Health & Long Term Care (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Health & Long Term Care (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-02-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-12 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Health & Long Term Care. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |