WA SB5880 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - Referred to Rules.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - Referred to Rules.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to education.
Title
Relating to education.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Hill [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |