WA SB5868 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing an exemption for certain lodging services from the convention and trade center tax.
Title
Providing an exemption for certain lodging services from the convention and trade center tax.
Sponsors
Sen. Pramila Jayapal [D] | Sen. Stephen Litzow [R] | Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Sen. Jan Angel [R] |
Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Moved to Rules White Sheet. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:45 PM. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:30 PM. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5868&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5868.pdf |