WA SB5862 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning public assistance eligibility requirements.
Title
Concerning public assistance eligibility requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | HSMH - Majority; without recommendation. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5862&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5862.pdf |