WA SB5859 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Investing in educational mentor programs.
Title
Investing in educational mentor programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Jesse Salomon [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] |
Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1281 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.