WA SB5850 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning identifying and responding to bias-based criminal offenses.
Title
Concerning identifying and responding to bias-based criminal offenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |