WA SB5848 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning licensure for music therapists.
Title
Concerning licensure for music therapists.
Sponsors
Sen. Annette Cleveland [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. John Lovick [D] |
Sen. Ron Muzzall [R] | Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] | Sen. June Robinson [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-02-16 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Public hearing scheduled, but not heard in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
18 | 120 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 130 | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |