WA SB5843 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Strengthening the review of the legislature's goals for tax preferences by requiring that every new tax preference provide an expiration date and statement of legislative intent. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Strengthening the review of the legislature's goals for tax preferences by requiring that every new tax preference provide a statement of legislative intent and include an expiration date where applicable. )
Title
Strengthening the review of the legislature's goals for tax preferences by requiring that every new tax preference provide an expiration date and statement of legislative intent. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Strengthening the review of the legislature's goals for tax preferences by requiring that every new tax preference provide a statement of legislative intent and include an expiration date where applicable. )
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-26 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 67 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2013-06-29 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-04-28 | Senate | On Concurrence Calendar. Referred to Senate Rules 3. |
2013-04-26 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 67; nays, 29; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2013-04-26 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-04-26 | House | Committee amendment adopted as amended. |
2013-04-24 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2013-04-23 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-04-23 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2013-04-23 | House | FIN - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-04-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2013-04-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2013-03-09 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 2:00 PM. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |