WA SB5842 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Restricting the use of social security numbers by insurance companies for the purpose of determining child support debt.
Title
Restricting the use of social security numbers by insurance companies for the purpose of determining child support debt.
Sponsors
Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Noel Frame [D] | Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] |
Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-15 | Senate | Effective date 6/6/2024. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Chapter 126, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-02-29 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2024-02-29 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-28 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-16 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-16 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2024-02-02 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | BFGT - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Business, Financial Services, Gaming & Trade. |
2023-12-13 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |