WA SB5829 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing paid family leave.
Title
Addressing paid family leave.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Fain [R] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | CLS - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5829&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5829.pdf |