WA SB5824 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing dependent youth with financial education and support.
Title
Providing dependent youth with financial education and support.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |