WA SB5812 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning local governments planning and zoning for accessory dwelling units.
Title
Concerning local governments planning and zoning for accessory dwelling units.
Sponsors
Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-02 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-02 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-02 | House | LG - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-13 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 38; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2019-03-11 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | HSA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1797 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - Referred to Local Government.