WA SB5811 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Effective date 6/6/2024*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Effective date 6/6/2024*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the definition of family member for individual providers.
Title
Expanding the definition of family member for individual providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) but without amendment(s) by Health Care & Wellness (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) but without amendment(s) by Health Care & Wellness (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Effective date 6/6/2024*. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Chapter 322, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-03-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 30; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2024-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 58; nays, 38; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-03-06 | House | Floor amendment |
2024-03-06 | House | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2024-03-06 | House | House receded from amendments. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments. |
2024-02-28 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2024-02-28 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-28 | House | Committee amendment |
2024-02-27 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-26 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2024-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2024-02-21 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-21 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-21 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2024-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-09 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 32; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2023-12-07 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1969 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 88b | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 39a | 076 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 39a | 341 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |