WA SB5810 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-30 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-30 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning foreclosures on deeds of trust.
Title
Concerning foreclosures on deeds of trust.
Sponsors
Sen. Jean Berkey [D] | Sen. Rosa Franklin [D] | Sen. Claudia Kauffman [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] | Sen. Rodney Tom [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-30 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-04-30 | Chapter 292, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-04-30 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-22 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-21 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-21 | President signed. | |
2009-04-20 | Passed final passage; yeas, 46; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-04-20 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2009-04-09 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-04-09 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-09 | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on second reading. | |
2009-03-30 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-26 | JUDI - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-03-26 | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-26 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-03-23 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-13 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2009-03-12 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 33; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-03-12 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-12 | Floor amendment | |
2009-03-12 | 1st substitute bill not substituted. | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-25 | FIHI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-24 | Public hearing, executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, and Housing & Insurance at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-02-18 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-02-03 | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1942 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.