WA HB1942 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning foreclosures on deeds of trust.
Title
Concerning foreclosures on deeds of trust.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-02-11 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-02-03 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5810 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-30 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1942&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1942.pdf |