WA SB5792 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning current use valuation under the property tax open space program.
Title
Concerning current use valuation under the property tax open space program.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Hatfield [D] | Sen. Janea Holmquist [R] | Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] | Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] |
Sen. Daniel Swecker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-02-24 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2009-02-24 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2009-02-24 | ARED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-23 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture & Rural Economic Development at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-02-10 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture & Rural Economic Development at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-02 | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Rural Economic Development. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1815 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-15 - Effective date 7/26/2009.