WA SB5785 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning department of fish and wildlife authority with regard to certain nonprofit and volunteer organizations.
Title
Concerning department of fish and wildlife authority with regard to certain nonprofit and volunteer organizations.
Sponsors
Sen. Judith Warnick [R] | Sen. Sharon Shewmake [D] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] |
Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | Effective date 6/6/2024. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Chapter 160, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-03-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2024-02-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2024-02-27 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-27 | House | Committee amendment |
2024-02-24 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-21 | House | AGNR - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2024-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2024-02-16 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2024-02-02 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
2023-12-04 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |