WA SB5774 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Effective date 7/28/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Effective date 7/28/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing applications for a special permit to allow alcohol tasting by persons nineteen and twenty years of age under certain circumstances.
Title
Authorizing applications for a special permit to allow alcohol tasting by persons nineteen and twenty years of age under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-09 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2013. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 59, 2013 Laws. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2013-04-16 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-04-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2013-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-04-08 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-03-26 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-03-21 | House | OVER - Majority; do pass. |
2013-03-21 | House | OVER - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-03-21 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Government Accountability & Oversight at 9:00 AM. |
2013-03-09 | House | First reading, referred to Government Accountability & Oversight |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 42; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | CL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |